IN HB1494 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 287
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 287
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires: (1) employees and volunteers of certain child care providers; and (2) for applicants applying for a license to operate a child care home, the applicant's spouse and certain household members of the applicant; to undergo national criminal history background checks. Provides that a child care provider that holds a license or registration on July 1, 2013 has until July 1, 2014 to meet the requirements regarding national criminal history background checks. Requires the state police department to release the result of a national criminal history background check to the division of family resources. Amends the list of felony convictions and certain other offenses related to the: (1) application, denial, and revocation of a child care license or registration; and (2) eligibility for child care voucher payments. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the committee on child care.)
Title
National criminal history background checks for child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 287 |
2013-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-23 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 576: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2013-04-16 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor |
2013-04-16 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reread third time: passed; Roll Call 447: yeas 42, nays 8 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third reading: call withdrawn |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Taylor |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-07 | House | Representative Mahan added as coauthor |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Summers |