IN HB1493 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Long term care and home health agencies. Requires a home and community based services program for individuals who are aged or disabled to include reimbursement for assisted living services in the Medicaid program. Requires the division of aging to report to the general assembly a plan to expand the scope and availability of home and community based services for individuals who are aged or disabled and requires the division to implement the plan. Prohibits the office of Medicaid policy and planning (office) from including certain individuals who receive nursing facility services in a Medicaid risk based managed care program or
Title
Long term care and home health agencies. Requires a home and community based services program for individuals who are aged or disabled to include reimbursement for assisted living services in the Medicaid program. Requires the division of aging to report to the general assembly a plan to expand the scope and availability of home and community based services for individuals who are aged or disabled and requires the division to implement the plan. Prohibits the office of Medicaid policy and planning (office) from including certain individuals who receive nursing facility services in a Medicaid risk based managed care program or
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] |
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Public Law 224 |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 510: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as advisor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senator Lanane removed as advisor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as conferee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as conferee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Lanane and Bohacek |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Mishler and Breaux |
2017-04-12 | House | House advisors appointed: Frizzell, Clere and Shackleford |
2017-04-12 | House | House conferees appointed: Brown T and Bauer |
2017-04-11 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 401: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau removed as cosponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Representative Clere added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Brown T |