IN HB1492 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 257
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 257
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Title 9 technical corrections. Makes technical and other corrections to statutes amended or affected by HEA 1087-2016.
Title
Title 9 technical corrections. Makes technical and other corrections to statutes amended or affected by HEA 1087-2016.
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] |
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Public Law 257 |
2017-04-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 440: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second sponsor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 343: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-07 | House | Representatives Pressel and Sullivan added as coauthors |
2017-02-07 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2017-02-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-06 | House | Representative Stemler added as coauthor |
2017-02-06 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2017-01-18 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |