IN HB1487 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Business services of the secretary of state. Amends the law concerning the business practices of the secretary of state, including: (1) access to information maintained by the secretary of state; (2) use of electronic information and transmissions; (3) striking the current Uniform Commercial Code (UCC) financing statement form; adding use of a format that meets certain criteria for the filings; and amending the UCC fees; (4) adding to the requirement to include a notary public's Indiana county on an authentication certificate; (5) amending requirements concerning notary public examination and education; (6) prohibiting performance of a notarial act: (a) to benefit oneself or one's spouse; or (b) when a commission is suspended or revoked; (7) specifying a notarial act fee applies; (8) providing for issuance of a certificate of fact for a notary public per signature; (9) requiring maintenance of a remote notary public electronic journal for 10 years; and (10) providing for nonresident corporate service of process on the secretary of state. Repeals current law concerning excavation contractor filings and precontracting documentation of compliance with underground facility damage law. Requires the formatting of certain documents to be approved by the International Association of Commercial Administrators or the secretary of state. Specifies October 1, 2019, as the date for a fee increase concerning the indexing of certain documents. Makes the law concerning remote notarial acts applicable only to a remote notarial act performed after the earlier of the effective date of certain administrative rules or July 1, 2020. Increases the fee that a notary public may charge for a remote notarial act from $15 to $25. Provides that, for certain filings, the provision of an electronic mail address is discretionary. Makes a technical amendment and conforming changes.
Title
Business services of the secretary of state. Amends the law concerning the business practices of the secretary of state, including: (1) access to information maintained by the secretary of state; (2) use of electronic information and transmissions; (3) striking the current Uniform Commercial Code (UCC) financing statement form; adding use of a format that meets certain criteria for the filings; and amending the UCC fees; (4) adding to the requirement to include a notary public's Indiana county on an authentication certificate; (5) amending requirements concerning notary public examination and education; (6) prohibiting performance of a notarial act: (a) to benefit oneself or one's spouse; or (b) when a commission is suspended or revoked; (7) specifying a notarial act fee applies; (8) providing for issuance of a certificate of fact for a notary public per signature; (9) requiring maintenance of a remote notary public electronic journal for 10 years; and (10) providing for nonresident corporate service of process on the secretary of state. Repeals current law concerning excavation contractor filings and precontracting documentation of compliance with underground facility damage law. Requires the formatting of certain documents to be approved by the International Association of Commercial Administrators or the secretary of state. Specifies October 1, 2019, as the date for a fee increase concerning the indexing of certain documents. Makes the law concerning remote notarial acts applicable only to a remote notarial act performed after the earlier of the effective date of certain administrative rules or July 1, 2020. Increases the fee that a notary public may charge for a remote notarial act from $15 to $25. Provides that, for certain filings, the provision of an electronic mail address is discretionary. Makes a technical amendment and conforming changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 36 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 36 N: 58 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Public Law 177 |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 467: yeas 71, nays 24 |
2019-04-08 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second sponsor |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as cosponsor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 80, nays 14 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 203: yeas 36, nays 58 |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |