IN HB1486 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second Reading: recommitted to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Second Reading: recommitted to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Education issues. Requires the state board of education (state board) to adopt voluntary prekindergarten standards that align with the kindergarten through grade 12 standards. Provides that records of the state board shall be kept by the state board. (Current law provides that the records are kept by the state superintendent of public instruction.) Provides that the state board oversees the operation of turnaround academies. Provides that the state board shall appoint an executive director of the state board. Provides that the state board may employ third party experts and consultants to assist the state board in carrying out the state
Title
Education issues. Requires the state board of education (state board) to adopt voluntary prekindergarten standards that align with the kindergarten through grade 12 standards. Provides that records of the state board shall be kept by the state board. (Current law provides that the records are kept by the state superintendent of public instruction.) Provides that the state board oversees the operation of turnaround academies. Provides that the state board shall appoint an executive director of the state board. Provides that the state board may employ third party experts and consultants to assist the state board in carrying out the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House Committee on Education - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Second Reading: recommitted to Committee on Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Thompson |