IN HB1484 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 260
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Language development for children who are deaf or hard of hearing. Provides that the director of the center for deaf and hard of hearing education (center) shall appoint an advisory committee. Requires the center to do the following: (1) Select language developmental milestones to include in a parent resource. (2) Approve tools and assessments for the assessment of children who are deaf or hard of hearing. (3) Develop and prepare a parent resource. (4) Prepare a report using data collected from the results of the assessments. Provides that the center may provide training and technical assistance concerning the use and administration of approved tools and assessments. Provides that the advisory committee shall do the following: (1) Collaborate with experts in: (A) selecting, for recommendation to the center, the language developmental milestones for inclusion in the parent resource; and (B) approving, for recommendation to the center, tools and assessments for children who are deaf or hard of hearing that are equivalent to tools and assessments for children who are not deaf or hard of hearing. (2) Provide to the center, not later than June 1, 2020, a list of the language developmental milestones that the advisory committee recommends that the center include in the parent resource and a list of tools and assessments that the advisory committee recommends the center approve for the assessment of children who are deaf or hard of hearing. (3) Conduct, at least once every five years, a review of the language developmental milestones selected and tools and assessments approved by the center. Provides that the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) may administer annually to a child who is: (1) less than three years of age; and (2) deaf or hard of hearing; at least one of the assessments approved by the center. Provides that each school corporation may administer annually to a child who: (1) is at least three years of age and less than 11 years of age; (2) is deaf or hard of hearing; and (3) has legal settlement in the school corporation; at least one of the assessments approved by the center. Allows a parent to opt out of the annual assessment if the parent provides, in writing, to the office or school corporation the parent's intent to opt out. Requires the office and each school corporation to provide to the center the results of any tools and assessments administered to a child.
Title
Language development for children who are deaf or hard of hearing. Provides that the director of the center for deaf and hard of hearing education (center) shall appoint an advisory committee. Requires the center to do the following: (1) Select language developmental milestones to include in a parent resource. (2) Approve tools and assessments for the assessment of children who are deaf or hard of hearing. (3) Develop and prepare a parent resource. (4) Prepare a report using data collected from the results of the assessments. Provides that the center may provide training and technical assistance concerning the use and administration of approved tools and assessments. Provides that the advisory committee shall do the following: (1) Collaborate with experts in: (A) selecting, for recommendation to the center, the language developmental milestones for inclusion in the parent resource; and (B) approving, for recommendation to the center, tools and assessments for children who are deaf or hard of hearing that are equivalent to tools and assessments for children who are not deaf or hard of hearing. (2) Provide to the center, not later than June 1, 2020, a list of the language developmental milestones that the advisory committee recommends that the center include in the parent resource and a list of tools and assessments that the advisory committee recommends the center approve for the assessment of children who are deaf or hard of hearing. (3) Conduct, at least once every five years, a review of the language developmental milestones selected and tools and assessments approved by the center. Provides that the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) may administer annually to a child who is: (1) less than three years of age; and (2) deaf or hard of hearing; at least one of the assessments approved by the center. Provides that each school corporation may administer annually to a child who: (1) is at least three years of age and less than 11 years of age; (2) is deaf or hard of hearing; and (3) has legal settlement in the school corporation; at least one of the assessments approved by the center. Allows a parent to opt out of the annual assessment if the parent provides, in writing, to the office or school corporation the parent's intent to opt out. Requires the office and each school corporation to provide to the center the results of any tools and assessments administered to a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | House | Public Law 260 |
2019-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | House | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 654: yeas 95, nays 2 |
2019-04-24 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz, Melton and Crane |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Kruse and Stoops |
2019-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: Brown T, Cook, Hamilton and Pfaff |
2019-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Clere and Porter |
2019-04-15 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 444: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Kruse) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Crane |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Raatz and Melton |
2019-02-12 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-16 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Porter, Behning and Thompson |
2019-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |