IN HB1482 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 284
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dealer services. Provides that a broker is not defined as a lead generation or other marketing service except in certain instances. Defines "dealer owner" for a business entity. Moves certain provisions providing temporary license plates and dealer plates to the dealer services law. Removes the requirement that a person must be licensed by the secretary of state before the person may possess for more than 30 days more than two inoperable motor vehicles. Provides that an automotive salvage recycler must be licensed by the secretary of state before the automotive salvage recycler may do certain activities. Requires that an automotive salvage recycler must report a purchase of a motor vehicle to the National Motor Vehicle Title Information System within 72 hours. (Current law requires 30 days.) Requires an automotive salvage recycler to allow the secretary of state, a police officer, or an agent of the secretary of state to inspect a certificate of authority. Changes the composition of the motor vehicle sales advisory board (board). Allows the board members to be reappointed. Requires that a zoning affidavit or statement be signed not more than 90 days before the affidavit or statement is submitted to the secretary of state as part of an application for various permits and licenses. Requires a dealer to submit an application for approval of a change to a dealer manager. Removes the provision providing for a manufacturer or distributor to recover costs under a uniform warranty reimbursement policy in certain instances. Requires a copy of a contract between a manufacturer or distributor and a franchisee be provided to the secretary of state. (Current law requires that the copy be submitted to the bureau of motor vehicles.) Makes conforming changes. Makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dealer services. Provides that a broker is not defined as a lead generation or other marketing service except in certain instances. Defines "dealer owner" for a business entity. Moves certain provisions providing temporary license plates and dealer plates to the dealer services law. Removes the requirement that a person must be licensed by the secretary of state before the person may possess for more than 30 days more than two inoperable motor vehicles. Provides that an automotive salvage recycler must be licensed by the secretary of state before the automotive salvage recycler may do certain activities. Requires that an automotive salvage recycler must report a purchase of a motor vehicle to the National Motor Vehicle Title Information System within 72 hours. (Current law requires 30 days.) Requires an automotive salvage recycler to allow the secretary of state, a police officer, or an agent of the secretary of state to inspect a certificate of authority. Changes the composition of the motor vehicle sales advisory board (board). Allows the board members to be reappointed. Requires that a zoning affidavit or statement be signed not more than 90 days before the affidavit or statement is submitted to the secretary of state as part of an application for various permits and licenses. Requires a dealer to submit an application for approval of a change to a dealer manager. Removes the provision providing for a manufacturer or distributor to recover costs under a uniform warranty reimbursement policy in certain instances. Requires a copy of a contract between a manufacturer or distributor and a franchisee be provided to the secretary of state. (Current law requires that the copy be submitted to the bureau of motor vehicles.) Makes conforming changes. Makes technical changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 74 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HousePublic Law 284
2019-05-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 567: yeas 74, nays 13
2019-04-18HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 492: yeas 36, nays 12
2019-04-11SenateAmendment #2 (Buck) failed; voice vote
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-09SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-01SenateSenator Holdman added as second sponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-02-08HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-07HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2019-02-07HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 80, nays 15
2019-02-04HouseRepresentative Austin added as coauthor
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Soliday added as coauthor
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Forestal added as coauthor
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2019-01-16HouseAuthored by Representative Sullivan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1482/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/2/2/9c223a5e/HB1482.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/1/9/3219dfe3/HB1482.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/9/3/7993d726/HB1482.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/5/8/3058b1d9/HB1482.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/0/1/9401b2b6/HB1482.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/9/0/6090b3b5/HB1482.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/6/a/fd6a1909/HB1482.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/0/5/d0052f51/HB1482.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/1/8/51180ae9/HB1482.115.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/b/b/2cbb9c94/HB1482.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/6/7/f267018d/HB1482.492.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/0/3/2303c743/HB1482.567.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback