IN HB1481 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public retirement plans. Provides that a political subdivision that participates in the public employees' retirement fund (fund) may participate in the public employees' defined contribution plan (plan), if the governing body adopts an ordinance or resolution that is filed with and approved by the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system (board). Provides that an individual who begins employment in a covered position with a political subdivision that participates in the plan may elect to become a member of the plan. Provides that, if an individual does not make an election to become a member of the plan,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public retirement plans. Provides that a political subdivision that participates in the public employees' retirement fund (fund) may participate in the public employees' defined contribution plan (plan), if the governing body adopts an ordinance or resolution that is filed with and approved by the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system (board). Provides that an individual who begins employment in a covered position with a political subdivision that participates in the plan may elect to become a member of the plan. Provides that, if an individual does not make an election to become a member of the plan,

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Pensions & Labor
2015-02-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-25HouseSenator Tallian added as second sponsor
2015-02-25HouseSenator Boots added as sponsor
2015-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-02-24HouseAmendment #2 (Arnold L) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-24HouseAmendment #1 (Ober) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-24HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-23HouseRepresentative Arnold added as coauthor
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-22HouseRepresentative Niezgodski removed as coauthor
2015-01-22HouseReferred to committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2015-01-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-15HouseRepresentative Harman added as coauthor
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2015-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Carbaugh and Niezgodski
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1481/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/b/2/4fb2c43c/HB1481.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/9/1/86912ece/HB1481.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/b/2/2fb2bf43/HB1481.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/7/b/0a7ba265/HB1481.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/b/3/51b3dc4e/HB1481.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/4/4/8d445421/HB1481.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/f/5/1df52d3a/HB1481.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/8/e/ea8e415c/HB1481.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/4/c/894c58c9/HB1481.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/4/4/ee44968f/HB1481.264.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback