IN HB1479 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Early voting. Provides that the county election board may adopt a resolution authorizing the circuit court clerk to use the office of the circuit court clerk or establish a satellite office to permit voters to cast absentee ballots for at least four hours on the third Saturday preceding election day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Pryor) failed (Y: 26 N: 64 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pryor) failed (Y: 29 N: 61 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HousePublic Law 118
2021-04-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 358: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-03-31HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 45, nays 4
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-15SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2021-02-09HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-08HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Walker G
2021-02-08HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-02-08HouseRepresentatives Pryor and Pfaff added as coauthors
2021-02-04HouseAmendment #2 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 69: yeas 26, nays 64
2021-02-04HouseAmendment #1 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 68: yeas 29, nays 61
2021-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-01HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Payne
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Wesco

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1479/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/5/9/18597df5/HB1479.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/2/8/8c284ec5/HB1479.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/5/2/41528ac0/HB1479.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/0/c/a20c219e/HB1479.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/9/3/5693d4c0/HB1479.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/4/8/e4488357/HB1479.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/8/1/038174aa/HB1479.04.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/6/7/17676962/HB1479.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/3/6/2136ec9a/HB1479.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/2/3/b5236ee8/HB1479.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/e/c/05ecc3e3/HB1479.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/1/d/461ddb99/HB1479.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/2/2/c4226d59/HB1479.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/d/1/28d1b0ae/HB1479.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/7/0/2270f489/HB1479.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/7/d/887d3126/HB1479.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/c/4/d9c42142/HB1479.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/b/e/11be0634/HB1479.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/9/6/90966018/HB1479.03.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/4/1/16418328/HB1479.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/f/2/02f23070/HB1479.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/b/f/22bf16f4/HB1479.68_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/e/f/c1efef79/HB1479.69_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/7/6/8d765b61/HB1479.92_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/b/4/bfb42cf3/HB1479.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/1/b/e01b275a/HB1479.268_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/1/d/4e1dcfe2/HB1479.358_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback