IN HB1478 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Battery against emergency room staff. Amends the definition of "emergency medical services provider" for the offense of battery to include a staff member in the emergency department of a hospital.
Title
Battery against emergency room staff.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Ann Vermilion [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Sen. Stacey Donato [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House Floor - (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Donato |
2021-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 78, nays 17 |
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Clere, Vermilion, Porter |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Engleman |