IN HB1476 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

County option property tax replacement fee. Permits a county council or county income tax council to establish an annual property tax replacement fee on any parcel receiving assessed value deductions or property tax credits (except for a parcel receiving a deduction or credit based on an individual's age, military or veteran's status, or a disability, including a spouse who is eligible for the deduction or credit) that reduce the annual property tax liability on the parcel to less than $200. Provides that the minimum annual amount due in property taxes plus the property tax replacement fee must be set by

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County option property tax replacement fee. Permits a county council or county income tax council to establish an annual property tax replacement fee on any parcel receiving assessed value deductions or property tax credits (except for a parcel receiving a deduction or credit based on an individual's age, military or veteran's status, or a disability, including a spouse who is eligible for the deduction or credit) that reduce the annual property tax liability on the parcel to less than $200. Provides that the minimum annual amount due in property taxes plus the property tax replacement fee must be set by

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Porter) prevailed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-25HouseSenator Hershman added as sponsor
2015-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 265: yeas 62, nays 30
2015-02-23HouseAmendment #2 (Porter) prevailed; Roll Call 215: yeas 96, nays 0
2015-02-23HouseAmendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; Roll Call 214: yeas 95, nays 0
2015-02-23HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-05HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor
2015-02-03HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Karickhoff

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback