IN HB1472 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Public Law 242
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that an attorney employed by a state agency is subject to the attorney-client and work product privileges. Permits a county council to impose a local service fee on each person that has business personal property exempt from taxation because the person's business personal property in the county has an acquisition cost of less than $20,000. Authorizes the department of local government finance (DLGF) to increase the maximum property tax levy of Brown Township, Jackson Township, and Blue River Township in Hancock County if the township submits a petition to the DLGF requesting the increase. Specifies the maximum increase that
Title
Specifies that an attorney employed by a state agency is subject to the attorney-client and work product privileges. Permits a county council to impose a local service fee on each person that has business personal property exempt from taxation because the person's business personal property in the county has an acquisition cost of less than $20,000. Authorizes the department of local government finance (DLGF) to increase the maximum property tax levy of Brown Township, Jackson Township, and Blue River Township in Hancock County if the township submits a petition to the DLGF requesting the increase. Specifies the maximum increase that
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Porter) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Porter) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Public Law 242 |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 539: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 558: yeas 78, nays 17 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Pete, Tallian and Bassler |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hershman and Broden |
2015-04-21 | House | House Advisors appointed: Brown T, Smaltz and Klinker |
2015-04-21 | House | House Conferees appointed: Negele and Pryor |
2015-04-16 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 461: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Broden) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pete added as second sponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Senator Hershman added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 82, nays 14 |
2015-02-19 | House | Amendment #3 (Porter) prevailed; Roll Call 183: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | Amendment #2 (Negele) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-19 | House | Amendment #1 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-19 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Negele |