IN HB1471 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recreational trails guidelines. Requires the division of outdoor recreation of the department of natural resources to develop recreational trails guidelines to address the following issues as they relate to recreational trails: (1) Clear statement of ownership and management of each trail. (2) Right-of-way inconsistencies. (3) Fence line and drainage issues. (4) Tree and brush control. (5) Weed and mowing issues. (6) Law enforcement jurisdiction issues. (7) Signage issues. (8) Conflict resolution procedures. (9) Appeal procedures. (10) Use by public utility facilities.
Title
Recreational trails guidelines. Requires the division of outdoor recreation of the department of natural resources to develop recreational trails guidelines to address the following issues as they relate to recreational trails: (1) Clear statement of ownership and management of each trail. (2) Right-of-way inconsistencies. (3) Fence line and drainage issues. (4) Tree and brush control. (5) Weed and mowing issues. (6) Law enforcement jurisdiction issues. (7) Signage issues. (8) Conflict resolution procedures. (9) Appeal procedures. (10) Use by public utility facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. William Friend [R] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. James Baird [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Public Law 67 |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 492: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 349: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | Representative Baird added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Arnold added as second sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Senator Houchin added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 250: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Eberhart |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Friend |