IN HB1465 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prescriptions and INSPECT program.
Title
Prescriptions and INSPECT program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 114 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 525: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 366: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Pat Miller |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-01-22 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Kubacki and Morris |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Davisson |