IN HB1462 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 205
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Secretary of state securities division matters. Allows the Indiana securities commissioner to request additional information for determining whether a franchise offer or sale is exempt from registration requirements. Provides that a continuing care retirement community's annual disclosure statement must be filed not later than 12 months following the end of its fiscal year. Provides that an individual may not engage in loan processing activities unless certain requirements have been met. Provides that a registered mortgage loan originator is not required to obtain a license under the law governing loan brokers. Provides that the securities division may discipline an individual who fails to comply with disclosure requirements. Amends the law on the licensing of collection agencies by adding a definition of "branch office" and providing that it is unlawful to operate a branch office without meeting certain requirements or to fail to comply with certain disclosure requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of state securities division matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 205
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-09SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2021-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-04-08SenateSenator Sandlin added as second sponsor
2021-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 369: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-04-06SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2021-02-02HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-01HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Holdman
2021-02-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 94, nays 2
2021-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-26HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Carbaugh, Schaibley, Mayfield
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Heaton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1462/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/b/9/d8b905a2/HB1462.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/7/1/3471ee03/HB1462.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/1/a/101ad5ad/HB1462.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/2/8/2c280545/HB1462.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/7/6/be76f01b/HB1462.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/a/1/d/aa1dd835/HB1462.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/6/f/d16fd3ed/HB1462.04.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/5/c/a65c8c0e/HB1462.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/b/a/16ba6333/HB1462.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/1/a/501a072d/HB1462.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/3/3/cf33d546/HB1462.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/b/cb9b1dad/HB1462.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/d/a/e3daa1fe/HB1462.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/0/b/a80baf5b/HB1462.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/e/a/cdea5d50/HB1462.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/f/b/cffbb51c/HB1462.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/b/0/4bb08e6c/HB1462.04.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/e/e/efeea040/HB1462.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/b/e/9abe0bd7/HB1462.29_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/5/f/045f9484/HB1462.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/0/a/e40a8a65/HB1462.369_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback