IN HB1460 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Reduces the number of members on the special funds board of managers from 13 to nine. Specifies that the county commissioners of Floyd County gain one appointee while each of the remaining appointing authorities loses at least one appointee. Requires that at least five of the members have experience in the tourism business. (Current law requires at least three of the members to have experience in the lodging business.) Specifies that the transition occurs January 15, 2012. Replaces population parameters and other classifications with the names of the affected communities. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clark County and Floyd County innkeeper's tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-22 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2011-02-21 Senate sponsor: Senator Grooms
2011-02-21 Referred to the Senate
2011-02-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 98, nays 0
2011-02-17 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-15 Representative Goodin added as coauthor
2011-02-15 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-25 Representative Stemler added as coauthor
2011-01-20 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2011-01-20 Coauthored by Representative Rhoads
2011-01-20 Authored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback