IN HB1456 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Servicemembers civil relief act. Creates the servicemembers civil relief act. Provides that protections under Indiana's civil relief act supplement protections for servicemembers under the federal servicemembers civil relief act.
Title
Servicemembers civil relief act. Creates the servicemembers civil relief act. Provides that protections under Indiana's civil relief act supplement protections for servicemembers under the federal servicemembers civil relief act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Public Law 156 |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | Representatives Bartlett, Harris, D., Niezgodski added as coauthors |
2015-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 511: yeas 82, nays 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | Representative Aylesworth added as coauthor |
2015-04-21 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-04-20 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 472: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senators Randolph and Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as third sponsor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs & The Military |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-02 | House | Representatives Arnold, Gutwein, Judy, Lucas, DeLaney, Harris, Kersey, Pelath, Baird, Price, Soliday added as coauthors |
2015-02-02 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-02-02 | House | Senator Banks A added as second sponsor |
2015-02-02 | House | Senator Glick added as sponsor |
2015-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 55: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-01-29 | House | Amendment #1 (Zent) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-01-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Moseley and Carbaugh |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Zent |