IN HB1453 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial selection in Lake and St. Joseph counties. Provides that the judicial nominating commission (commission) for the Lake and St. Joseph superior courts consists of seven voting members, with three voting members appointed by the governor and three voting members appointed by the county board of commissioners, and the chief justice of Indiana or the chief justice's designee serving ex officio as a voting member only to resolve tie votes and as chairperson of the commission. (Current law provides that the commission for the Lake superior court consists of nine members.) Provides that the governor must appoint to the commission one attorney member, one nonattorney member who has never been licensed to practice law, and one member that is a woman. Provides that the county board of commissioners must appoint to the commission one attorney member, one nonattorney member who has never been licensed to practice law, and one member that is from a minority group. Provides that the chairperson of the commission shall have standing to dispute the validity of an appointed member. Provides that a voting member of the commission for: (1) the Lake superior court shall reside in Lake County; and (2) the St. Joseph superior court shall reside in St. Joseph County. Provides that a voting member may not have a prior felony conviction. Repeals provisions concerning the appointment of nonattorney commissioners and the election of attorney commissioners to the commission. Provides that after the commission has nominated and submitted to the governor the names of five persons to fill a vacancy in the Lake or St. Joseph superior court, the governor shall select the most qualified person to fill the vacancy. (Current law provides that the commission for the Lake superior court nominate and submit to the governor the names of three people to fill a vacancy in the superior court.) Makes conforming changes.
Title
Judicial selection in Lake and St. Joseph counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] | Rep. Harold Slager [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 52 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed (Y: 4 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #10 (Lanane) failed (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed (Y: 22 N: 64 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed (Y: 4 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #6 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #10 (Lanane) failed (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Smith V) failed (Y: 27 N: 62 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed (Y: 22 N: 64 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Public Law 204 |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 440: yeas 52, nays 35 |
2021-04-08 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 339: yeas 34, nays 13 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed; Roll Call 306: yeas 11, nays 35 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed; Roll Call 305: yeas 4, nays 42 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Randolph Lonnie M) failed; Roll Call 304: yeas 7, nays 40 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 303: yeas 15, nays 31 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-08 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Niemeyer and Rogers |
2021-02-08 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 63, nays 31 |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment #1 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 67: yeas 27, nays 62 |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 66: yeas 22, nays 64 |
2021-02-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Teshka and Slager |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Aylesworth |