IN HB1453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-31 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Appellate defender and misdemeanor reimbursement. Establishes the office of the state appellate defender and the juvenile defense office to provide direct appeals for indigent individuals. Provides that a case that originates from Lake or Marion County is exempt from receiving services from the office of the state appellate defender. Provides that a juvenile delinquency case that originates from Marion County is exempt from receiving services from the state appellate defender juvenile defense office. Provides that a county may be reimbursed for indigent services provided for misdemeanors in a superior or circuit court.
Title
Appellate defender and misdemeanor reimbursement. Establishes the office of the state appellate defender and the juvenile defense office to provide direct appeals for indigent individuals. Provides that a case that originates from Lake or Marion County is exempt from receiving services from the office of the state appellate defender. Provides that a juvenile delinquency case that originates from Marion County is exempt from receiving services from the state appellate defender juvenile defense office. Provides that a county may be reimbursed for indigent services provided for misdemeanors in a superior or circuit court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-28 | House | Representatives Steuerwald, Dvorak, Porter added as coauthors |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Young J |