IN HB1453 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 449: yeas 23, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 449: yeas 23, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hunting preserves. Provides for the initial licensing and operation of hunting preserves: (1) on which Indiana farm raised and released cervidae are hunted; and (2) that operated during the 2014 calendar year. Establishes licensing requirements, inspection requirements, and fees. Exempts licensed hunting preserves from the licensing requirements for game breeders and shooting preserves. Provides that hunters on hunting preserves are required to have a special hunting license. Specifies that the fee for the special hunting license is equal to the fee for a nonresident annual hunting license. Provides that hunters are not subject to bag limits. Requires that a transportation
Title
Hunting preserves. Provides for the initial licensing and operation of hunting preserves: (1) on which Indiana farm raised and released cervidae are hunted; and (2) that operated during the 2014 calendar year. Establishes licensing requirements, inspection requirements, and fees. Exempts licensed hunting preserves from the licensing requirements for game breeders and shooting preserves. Provides that hunters on hunting preserves are required to have a special hunting license. Specifies that the fee for the special hunting license is equal to the fee for a nonresident annual hunting license. Provides that hunters are not subject to bag limits. Requires that a transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Daniel Leonard [R] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] |
Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Moed) failed (Y: 29 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Washburne) failed (Y: 20 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Moed) failed (Y: 29 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Washburne) failed (Y: 20 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 449: yeas 23, nays 27 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reread second time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Leising added as cosponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Steele added as cosponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Yoder added as third sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Messmer added as second sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Senator Glick added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 55, nays 39 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment #2 (Moed) failed; Roll Call 147: yeas 29, nays 67 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment #3 (Washburne) failed; Roll Call 146: yeas 20, nays 74 |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Representatives Leonard, Ober, Lehe added as coauthors |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Eberhart |