IN HB1450 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 255
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Property tax matters. Provides that a political subdivision must upload a copy of a contract that the political subdivision enters into after June 30, 2016, to the Indiana transparency Internet web site if the total cost of the contract exceeds $50,000. Specifies the definition of "low income rental property" for purposes of property tax assessment. Specifies the total true tax value of low income rental property that is used to provide Medicaid assisted living services. Allows the department of local government finance (DLGF) to use estimated data to compute six year rolling averages for the purpose of determining the annual

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax matters. Provides that a political subdivision must upload a copy of a contract that the political subdivision enters into after June 30, 2016, to the Indiana transparency Internet web site if the total cost of the contract exceeds $50,000. Specifies the definition of "low income rental property" for purposes of property tax assessment. Specifies the total true tax value of low income rental property that is used to provide Medicaid assisted living services. Allows the department of local government finance (DLGF) to use estimated data to compute six year rolling averages for the purpose of determining the annual

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 255
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 530: yeas 50, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 551: yeas 85, nays 0
2017-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-21SenateSenator Hershman added as conferee
2017-04-21SenateSenator Mishler removed as conferee
2017-04-12SenateSenate advisors appointed: Raatz, Stoops, Sandlin and Buck
2017-04-12SenateSenate conferees appointed: Mishler and Randolph Lonnie M
2017-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Sullivan, Speedy, Smith M, Braun, Harris and Brown C
2017-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Leonard and Pryor
2017-04-10HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-10HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 421: yeas 48, nays 0
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #3 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Mishler and Raatz
2017-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 91, nays 0
2017-02-23HouseAmendment #2 (Saunders) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23HouseAmendment #1 (Braun) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-24HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as coauthor
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-18HouseAuthored by Representative Leonard

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1450/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/6/d/4c6d5302/HB1450.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/0/0/b3008c25/HB1450.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/d/0/12d047ef/HB1450.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/c/a/c7ca8132/HB1450.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/2/9/66298638/HB1450.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/6/8/0668acc7/HB1450.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/1/3/3e13c757/HB1450.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/c/4/ebc4d55e/HB1450.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/1/d/da1dc225/HB1450.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/4/c/2c4ce70d/HB1450.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/e/d/ededf2b5/HB1450.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/c/b/f5cbc3c6/HB1450.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/7/0/9170df29/HB1450.231.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/d/b/82db4c0a/HB1450.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/4/e/f44e255b/HB1450.421.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/3/c/c23c826f/HB1450.530.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/5/6/6b56c08d/HB1450.551.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback