IN HB1449 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Patricia, Breaux and Grooms
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Patricia, Breaux and Grooms
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid treatment. Limits Medicaid reimbursement for Subutex and Suboxone or an similar trade name or generic of the drug when the drug was prescribed for the treatment of pain management to only if the drug was prescribed by a physician who meets certain requirements. Allows for the office of Medicaid policy and planning to require prior authorization for these drugs when being prescribed for substance abuse treatment as determined by the board or when being prescribed for more than six months. Authorizes the division of mental health and addiction (division) to approve before June 30, 2018, not more than five
Title
Opioid treatment. Limits Medicaid reimbursement for Subutex and Suboxone or an similar trade name or generic of the drug when the drug was prescribed for the treatment of pain management to only if the drug was prescribed by a physician who meets certain requirements. Allows for the office of Medicaid policy and planning to require prior authorization for these drugs when being prescribed for substance abuse treatment as determined by the board or when being prescribed for more than six months. Authorizes the division of mental health and addiction (division) to approve before June 30, 2018, not more than five
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Charlie Brown [D] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Patricia, Breaux and Grooms |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hershman and Stoops |
2015-04-20 | House | House Advisors appointed: Brown T, Lehe and Bauer |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees appointed: Davisson and Brown C |
2015-04-16 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2015-04-16 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 464: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as cosponsor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as third sponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as sponsor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat removed as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Grooms added as second sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Miller, Pat added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Representative Bacon added as coauthor |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | House | Representative Brown, T. added as coauthor |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2015-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Brown C |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Davisson |