IN HB1447 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 234
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Provides that, if a school corporation or qualified school uses a third party vendor in providing certain personal analyses, evaluations, or surveys, the third party vendor and the school corporation or qualified school may not record, collect, or maintain the responses to or results of the analysis, evaluation, or survey in a manner that would identify the responses or results of an individual student. Provides that, if a school corporation or qualified school uses a third party vendor in providing the personal analysis, evaluation, or survey, the school corporation or qualified school must provide parents or students, as applicable, two requests for written consent before administering the analysis, evaluation, or survey. Provides that the school corporation or qualified school may administer the personal analysis, evaluation, or survey if a parent or student, as applicable, does not decline the analysis, evaluation, or survey. Requires each school corporation or qualified school to: (1) post a copy of a personal analysis, evaluation, or survey on the school corporation's or qualified school's website; and (2) send with each notice an explanation of the reasons that the school corporation or qualified school is administering the personal analysis, evaluation, or survey. Requires each qualified school to establish and maintain a grievance procedure for complaints regarding a violation of this provision. Provides that, if a state agency, school corporation, or qualified school or an employee of a state agency, school corporation, or qualified school requires, makes part of a course, awards a grade or course credit, or otherwise incentivizes a student to engage in: (1) political activism; (2) lobbying; or (3) efforts to persuade members of the legislative or executive branch at the federal, state, or local level; the state agency, school corporation, or qualified school or the employee of the state agency, school corporation, or qualified school shall not require the student to adopt, affirm, affiliate, or take any action that would result in favoring any particular position on the issue or issues involved without offering an alternative option for the student to complete the assignment or receive extra credit or other incentivization that allows for the favoring of an alternative position. After June 30, 2023, requires certain contracts between a school corporation or a qualified school and a third party vendor concerning a personal analysis, survey, or evaluation to contain a breach of contract provision. Requires schools to adopt policies and procedures concerning material alleged to be obscene or harmful to minors. Removes schools from the list of entities eligible for a specified defense to such criminal prosecutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04HousePublic Law 234
2023-05-04HouseSigned by the Governor
2023-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2023-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2023-04-27SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 520: yeas 39, nays 10
2023-04-27HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 535: yeas 69, nays 28
2023-04-27SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2023-04-27HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2023-04-26HouseRepresentative Cash added as conferee
2023-04-26HouseRepresentative Smith V removed as conferee
2023-04-26HouseRepresentative Cash removed as advisor
2023-04-26SenateSenator Raatz added as conferee
2023-04-26SenateSenator Hunley removed as conferee
2023-04-26SenateSenator Raatz removed as advisor
2023-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Ford J.D., Raatz and Tomes
2023-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Donato and Hunley
2023-04-10HouseRepresentative Behning added as advisor
2023-04-10HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as conferee
2023-04-10HouseRepresentative Lehman removed as conferee
2023-04-06HouseHouse advisors appointed: Schaibley, Cash, DeLaney and Pfaff
2023-04-06HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehman and Smith V
2023-04-06HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2023-04-06HouseMotion to dissent filed
2023-04-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2023-04-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 37, nays 10
2023-03-30SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-03-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-03-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2023-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2023-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 94, nays 0
2023-02-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Donato and Raatz
2023-02-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2023-02-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2023-02-16HouseRepresentative Cash B added as coauthor
2023-02-14HouseRepresentative McGuire J added as coauthor
2023-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2023-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Schaibley

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback