IN HB1444 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the topic of taxation of: (1) CBD oil; and (2) vaping products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the topic of taxation of: (1) CBD oil; and (2) vaping products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 53 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Brown L, Breaux, Holdman and Mishler
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Tallian
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Judy, Karickhoff, Porter and Pryor
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Brown T and Klinker
2019-04-17HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-17HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-17SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 491: yeas 45, nays 2
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #3 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-01SenateSenator Mishler added as third sponsor
2019-03-28SenateSenator Holdman added as second sponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 53, nays 40
2019-02-11HouseAmendment #3 (Porter) failed; voice vote
2019-02-11HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; voice vote
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-16HouseRepresentative Karickhoff added as coauthor
2019-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-15HouseCoauthored by Representative Huston
2019-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Brown T

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1444/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/c/a/2bca780e/HB1444.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/8/6/b78676fb/HB1444.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/c/e/dfce1be8/HB1444.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/4/8/1f48e4b7/HB1444.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/0/4/e60421a8/HB1444.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/e/0/3ce0e4f4/HB1444.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/0/e/f00ec107/HB1444.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/b/6/03b6bdd1/HB1444.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/c/5/6ec579b6/HB1444.155.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/c/9/7ec9c485/HB1444.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/5/c/595cc9b1/HB1444.491.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback