IN HB1444 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications. Specifies that a person that controls, directly or indirectly, a person that violates certain requirements concerning unlawful telephone solicitation (the "do not call" statute) is equally liable for the violation. Defines "caller" for purposes of the "do not call" statute. Defines "pecuniary loss" for purposes of an offense against computer users, and increases the penalty for an offense against computer users (including "ransomware" attacks) based on the pecuniary loss. Specifies that certain offenses against computer users are deceptive acts actionable by the attorney general.
Title
Telecommunications. Specifies that a person that controls, directly or indirectly, a person that violates certain requirements concerning unlawful telephone solicitation (the "do not call" statute) is equally liable for the violation. Defines "caller" for purposes of the "do not call" statute. Defines "pecuniary loss" for purposes of an offense against computer users, and increases the penalty for an offense against computer users (including "ransomware" attacks) based on the pecuniary loss. Specifies that certain offenses against computer users are deceptive acts actionable by the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Law 153 |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 490: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 420: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as cosponsor |
2017-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Representative Schaibley added as coauthor |
2017-02-22 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Zay, Doriot and Head |
2017-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | Representatives Morris and Speedy added as coauthors |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment #1 (Dvorak) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | House | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Judy |