IN HB1441 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Full faith and credit for tribal court orders. Requires that, under certain circumstances, a court of record in Indiana shall give full faith and credit to judgments and orders of a tribal court affiliated with the Pokagon Band of Potawatomi Indians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Full faith and credit for tribal court orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 201
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 392: yeas 87, nays 0
2021-03-25HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-23SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2021-03-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 267: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-03-22SenateAmendment #1 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Niezgodski
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-02-15HouseRepresentative Dvorak added as coauthor
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Steuerwald
2021-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative DeLaney

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1441/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/2/e/2b2e3858/HB1441.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/2/9/5f29f3ca/HB1441.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/c/4/93c4d7f6/HB1441.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/c/1/62c116e8/HB1441.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/c/d/eccdf1f2/HB1441.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/8/5/53851bab/HB1441.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/0/7/3507151b/HB1441.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/0/2/72024fbc/HB1441.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/e/0/08e0796d/HB1441.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/9/0/df907617/HB1441.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/f/6/6ef6a55a/HB1441.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/b/0/5bb058ea/HB1441.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/7/3/9673d638/HB1441.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/4/b/514bc847/HB1441.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/4/a/8b4ad428/HB1441.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/6/7/45671519/HB1441.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/1/8/da187315/HB1441.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/7/2/c07258b0/HB1441.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/f/a/6efa0855/HB1441.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/4/5/0c45a267/HB1441.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/e/b/20ebf47f/HB1441.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/7/4/ce746a89/HB1441.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/2/5/2625cfd5/HB1441.152_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/d/c/a7dc662e/HB1441.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/2/0/3920426a/HB1441.267_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/d/b/77db0fa7/HB1441.392_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback