IN HB1438 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Representatives Huston, Pierce, Hatfield added as coauthors
Pending: House Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Water and wastewater infrastructure. Establishes the water infrastructure task force to examine an inventory and assessment of the water resources of the state and study other subjects related to water and wastewater infrastructure. Requires the water infrastructure task force to issue a report setting forth its findings and recommendations not later than December 1, 2019. Requires a water utility to submit a water loss audit report to the utility regulatory commission (commission) every year, beginning with the water loss audit report due before July 1, 2021. Requires the water loss audit report to be submitted in 2021 and the water loss audit reports to be submitted in each subsequent odd-numbered year to be accompanied by an independent, level one validation of the water loss audit report. Requires the commission to adopt rules concerning water loss audits. Requires the commission, after June 30, 2022, and before July 1, 2023, to consider adopting rules to require water utilities to meet certain performance standards for the volume of their water losses. Requires the department of environmental management to establish and maintain a water data collection hub in which all quantitative information concerning the water resources of the state that is gathered by or reported to state agencies will be stored. Requires the environmental rules board to adopt rules concerning the water data collection hub. Urges the governor to create a position or an office within the administrative branch of government to oversee and coordinate the water related programs and activities of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water and wastewater infrastructure. Establishes the water infrastructure task force to examine an inventory and assessment of the water resources of the state and study other subjects related to water and wastewater infrastructure. Requires the water infrastructure task force to issue a report setting forth its findings and recommendations not later than December 1, 2019. Requires a water utility to submit a water loss audit report to the utility regulatory commission (commission) every year, beginning with the water loss audit report due before July 1, 2021. Requires the water loss audit report to be submitted in 2021 and the water loss audit reports to be submitted in each subsequent odd-numbered year to be accompanied by an independent, level one validation of the water loss audit report. Requires the commission to adopt rules concerning water loss audits. Requires the commission, after June 30, 2022, and before July 1, 2023, to consider adopting rules to require water utilities to meet certain performance standards for the volume of their water losses. Requires the department of environmental management to establish and maintain a water data collection hub in which all quantitative information concerning the water resources of the state that is gathered by or reported to state agencies will be stored. Requires the environmental rules board to adopt rules concerning the water data collection hub. Urges the governor to create a position or an office within the administrative branch of government to oversee and coordinate the water related programs and activities of the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseRepresentatives Huston, Pierce, Hatfield added as coauthors
2019-01-15HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2019-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback