IN HB1437 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Public Law 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Public Law 88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic meetings and signatures. Allows a member of a governing body of a political subdivision to participate in a meeting electronically subject to the following: (1) Requires the governing body to adopt a written policy establishing procedures for electronic participation. (2) Requires the technology to permit simultaneous communication between members and the public to attend and observe the proceedings. (3) Requires at least 50% of the members to be physically present at the meeting site. (4) Allows a member participating electronically to be counted for quorum purposes. (5) Provides that a member participating electronically may participate in a final action taken by the governing body only if the member can be seen and heard. Exempts governing bodies of state agencies that have a majority of members with disabilities from certain attendance requirements. Provides that if a statute requires a manual signature for attesting or authenticating an obligation issued by certain state and local public entities, an electronic signature has the same force and effect as a manual signature. Adds provisions applicable to state and local public agencies when a state or local disaster emergency is declared. Makes stylistic changes.
Title
Electronic meetings and signatures.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] | Rep. John Bartlett [D] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 () failed (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Amendment #1 () failed (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Public Law 88 |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 390: yeas 82, nays 6 |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as third sponsor |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senator Donato added as second sponsor |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-18 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Rogers |
2021-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 86, nays 7 |
2021-02-16 | House | Amendment #1 (Andrade) failed; Roll Call 132: yeas 29, nays 64 |
2021-02-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-15 | House | Representative Bartlett added as coauthor |
2021-02-15 | House | Representative Hamilton added as coauthor |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2021-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative Rowray |
2021-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Cook |