IN HB1434 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of child services. Makes changes to the child services and juvenile laws concerning the following: (1) Criminal history background checks. (2) Exception of certain governmental employees to licensing or certification requirements of social workers and counselors. (3) The responsibilities of the department of child services. (4) Transitional services plans for certain individuals receiving foster care or collaborative care. (5) Regional service strategic plans. (6) Foster care. (7) Detention of children alleged to be children in needs of services. (8) Case plans for children in need of services. (9) Dispositional decrees and review of disposition decrees concerning children in needs
Title
Department of child services. Makes changes to the child services and juvenile laws concerning the following: (1) Criminal history background checks. (2) Exception of certain governmental employees to licensing or certification requirements of social workers and counselors. (3) The responsibilities of the department of child services. (4) Transitional services plans for certain individuals receiving foster care or collaborative care. (5) Regional service strategic plans. (6) Foster care. (7) Detention of children alleged to be children in needs of services. (8) Case plans for children in need of services. (9) Dispositional decrees and review of disposition decrees concerning children in needs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Niezgodski) failed (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Niezgodski) failed (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Public Law 104 |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 491: yeas 85, nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Committee on Family & Children Services |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Arnold added as cosponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Houchin added as third sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Senator Head added first sponsor |
2015-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Amendment #2 (Niezgodski) failed; Roll Call 19: yeas 29, nays 69 |
2015-01-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Thompson) motion withdrawn |
2015-01-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2015-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara, Miller D, Summers |
2015-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Mahan |