IN HB1433 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Reimbursement for prosthetic and orthotic devices. Provides that orthotic devices are provided under Medicaid. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to apply for any state plan amendment or waiver necessary to include prosthetic and orthotic devices under Medicaid. Specifies that a minor may receive a prosthetic or orthotic device for the recipient's medical needs and a device for recreational activities. Requires reimbursement for the replacement of an orthotic device or a prosthetic device for a minor for certain reasons.
Title
Reimbursement for prosthetic and orthotic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senators Rogers and Yoder added as cosponsors |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | Representative Barrett added as coauthor |
2023-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2023-02-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Busch and Niemeyer |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-20 | House | Representative Fleming added as coauthor |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-13 | House | Representative Olthoff added as coauthor |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Slager |
Subjects
FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
HEALTH generally
HEALTH, Health Care Professionals
WELFARE, Medicaid
HEALTH generally
HEALTH, Health Care Professionals
WELFARE, Medicaid