IN HB1432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 258
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Parental incarceration. Provides that a child in need of services (CHINS) case plan must include a description and discussion of: (1) the services and treatment available to an incarcerated parent at the facility at which the parent is incarcerated; and (2) how the parent and child may be afforded visitation opportunities, unless visitation with the parent is not in the best interests of the child. Requires a CHINS dispositional decree to provide a reasonable opportunity for a parent of the child who: (1) is incarcerated; and (2) has maintained a meaningful role in the child's life; to maintain a relationship with the child, subject to the safety of the community and best interests of the child. Provides that a motion to dismiss a petition to terminate a parent-child relationship (TPR) may be filed if: (1) the parent is incarcerated or the parent's prior incarceration is a significant factor in the child having been under the supervision of the department of child services (DCS) or a county probation department for at least 15 of the most recent 22 months; (2) the parent maintains a meaningful role in the child's life; (3) DCS has not documented a reason to conclude that it would otherwise be in the child's best interests to terminate the parent-child relationship; and (4) the parent is not incarcerated due to conviction for certain crimes. Provides that in determining whether to grant the motion to dismiss the TPR, the court may consider the length of time remaining in the incarcerated parent's sentence and any other factor the court considers relevant.
Title
Parental incarceration. Provides that a child in need of services (CHINS) case plan must include a description and discussion of: (1) the services and treatment available to an incarcerated parent at the facility at which the parent is incarcerated; and (2) how the parent and child may be afforded visitation opportunities, unless visitation with the parent is not in the best interests of the child. Requires a CHINS dispositional decree to provide a reasonable opportunity for a parent of the child who: (1) is incarcerated; and (2) has maintained a meaningful role in the child's life; to maintain a relationship with the child, subject to the safety of the community and best interests of the child. Provides that a motion to dismiss a petition to terminate a parent-child relationship (TPR) may be filed if: (1) the parent is incarcerated or the parent's prior incarceration is a significant factor in the child having been under the supervision of the department of child services (DCS) or a county probation department for at least 15 of the most recent 22 months; (2) the parent maintains a meaningful role in the child's life; (3) DCS has not documented a reason to conclude that it would otherwise be in the child's best interests to terminate the parent-child relationship; and (4) the parent is not incarcerated due to conviction for certain crimes. Provides that in determining whether to grant the motion to dismiss the TPR, the court may consider the length of time remaining in the incarcerated parent's sentence and any other factor the court considers relevant.
Sponsors
Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Vanessa Summers [D] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | House | Public Law 258 |
2019-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 604: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 578: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Crane, Breaux, Ford Jon and Randolph Lonnie M |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Ford J.D. |
2019-04-08 | House | House advisors appointed: DeVon, Frizzell, Boy, Jackson and Summers |
2019-04-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Macer |
2019-04-02 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 332: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senators Crane and Ford Jon added as cosponsors |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Young M and Niezgodski |
2019-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Representative Summers added as coauthor |
2019-02-07 | House | Amendment #1 (Macer) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-05 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2019-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Macer |