IN HB1429 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "textbook" to include certain hardware, software, and digital content. Adds a definition of "curricular materials". Removes the authority of the state board of education to adopt a list of approved textbooks, and requires the governing body of each school corporation to adopt textbooks for the school corporation. Requires the department of education to review curricular materials, evaluate the curricular materials alignment to state academic standards, and publish the reviews, which governing bodies may use in making textbook adoption decisions. Repeals references to the state textbook advisory committee and the state board adoption of textbooks, and makes corresponding changes to related sections.
Title
Textbooks and other curricular material.
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 73 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 349: yeas 40 and nays 9 | |
2011-04-11 | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2011-02-15 | Representatives Austin and Klinker added as coauthors | |
2011-02-14 | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Yoder | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 80, nays 11 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment 5 (Yarde), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-03 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-18 | Coauthored by Representative Behning | |
2011-01-18 | Authored by Representative Yarde |