IN HB1427 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Various education matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Kersey), failed (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 286
2013-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-26HouseConference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 658: yeas 53, nays 45
2013-04-26HouseHouse consideration of CCR-1: withdrawn
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 581: yeas 34, nays 15
2013-04-26SenateRules suspended
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateSenate conferee appointed: Yoder
2013-04-26SenateSenator Skinner removed as conferee
2013-04-26HouseRepresentative Thompson added as conferee
2013-04-26HouseRepresentative V. Smith removed as conferee
2013-04-26SenateSenator Skinner added as conferee
2013-04-26SenateSenator Skinner removed as advisor
2013-04-26SenateSenator Rogers removed as conferee
2013-04-25SenateSenate advisors appointed: Kruse, Broden, Kenley and Skinner
2013-04-25SenateSenate conferee appointed: Schneider and Rogers
2013-04-24HouseHouse advisors appointed: Behning, Huston, Battles, Errington, VanDenburgh and Moed
2013-04-24HouseHouse conferees appointed: Rhoads and V. Smith
2013-04-24HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2013-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-04-10SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 442: yeas 37 and nays 13
2013-04-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c) technical corrections.
2013-04-09SenateSenator Banks added as cosponsor
2013-04-09SenateSenator Schneider added as second sponsor
2013-04-09SenateSenator Schneider removed as cosponsor
2013-04-09SenateSenator Banks removed as second sponsor
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 8 (Kruse), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 7 (Kruse), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 5 (Kenley), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 4 (Kenley), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 2 (Rogers), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateAmendment 1 (Head), prevailed; voice vote
2013-04-09SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2013-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-04-02SenateSenator Schneider added as cosponsor
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2013-02-12HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Banks
2013-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 65, nays 33
2013-02-11HouseAmendment 5 (Kersey), failed; Roll Call 89: yeas 36, nays 62
2013-02-11HouseAmendment 2 (Rhoads), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-11HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-22HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2013-01-22HouseCoauthored by Representative Behning
2013-01-22HouseAuthored by Representative Rhoads

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2013&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=HB&docno=1427
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/IN/IN1427.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1427.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HB/HB1427.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1427.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1427.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/EH/EH1427.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/HE/HE1427.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0089.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0118.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0442.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Srollcal/0581.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2013/PDF/Hrollcal/0658.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback