IN HB1425 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-25 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Court fees. Automated record keeping fee. Provides that after June 30, 2015, the automated record keeping fee collected for all civil, criminal, infraction, and ordinance violation actions, except actions concerning pretrial diversion programs and deferral programs, is $9. Specifies that 100% of the $9 automated record keeping fee is distributed to the auditor of state for deposit in the state user fee fund. Provides that after June 30, 2015, the automated record keeping fee with respect to actions resulting in the accused person entering into a: (1) pretrial diversion program agreement; or (2) deferral program agreement; is $5. Specifies that

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court fees. Automated record keeping fee. Provides that after June 30, 2015, the automated record keeping fee collected for all civil, criminal, infraction, and ordinance violation actions, except actions concerning pretrial diversion programs and deferral programs, is $9. Specifies that 100% of the $9 automated record keeping fee is distributed to the auditor of state for deposit in the state user fee fund. Provides that after June 30, 2015, the automated record keeping fee with respect to actions resulting in the accused person entering into a: (1) pretrial diversion program agreement; or (2) deferral program agreement; is $5. Specifies that

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Ways and Means - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-23HouseSenator Bray added as cosponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Broden added as third sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Kenley added as second sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Waltz added as sponsor
2015-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 79, nays 17
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-05HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2015-02-05HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseRepresentative Torr added as coauthor
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives McMillin and DeLaney
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Steuerwald

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback