IN HB1423 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the electric utility may recover the purchase price through a fuel adjustment charge. Requires an electric utility to provide, upon request, back up, maintenance, and supplementary power to a private generation project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the owner of a private generation project to sell excess electric output generated by the project to an electric utility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Roll Call 142302 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Utilities and Energy - Roll Call 142301 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 222
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 424: yeas 59 and nays 27
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 344: yeas 47 and nays 0
2014-03-04SenateSenator Hershman added third sponsor.
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1423 Amendment #1 (Merritt), prevailed.
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-24SenateSenator Leising added second sponsor.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Utilities
2014-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-02-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 211: yeas 95 and nays 0
2014-02-03HouseSenator Merritt added as first sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Hale added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseRepresentative Battles added as coauthor.
2014-01-28HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-27HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as coauthor.
2014-01-27HouseRepresentative Koch added as author.
2014-01-21HouseReassigned to the Utilities and Energy
2014-01-21HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedures

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1423/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/e/7/fde7ea71/HB1423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/c/d/04cda156/HB1423.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/2/1/2e217158/HB1423.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/9/1/5791ce65/HB1423.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/c/6/57c6d51a/HB1423.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/1/d/2e1daa81/HB1423.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/b/f/7bbfb048/HB1423.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/3/8/4738c0b0/HB1423.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/1/b/471be428/HB1423.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/3/c/713c4049/HB1423.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/2/d/1c2db1cf/HB1423.02.COMH.211.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/f/1/c9f1b604/HB1423.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/5/2/36524705/HB1423.04.ENGS.344.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/f/4/b7f49ded/HB1423.04.ENGS.424.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback