IN HB1423 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 285
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 285
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Antibullying.
Title
Antibullying.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 285 |
2013-05-11 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 554: yeas 67, nays 9 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senator Alting added as cosponsor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 441: yeas 36 and nays 14 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 3 (Schneider), rejected; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as cosponsor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senator Pete Miller added as first sponsor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senator Wyss removed as first sponsor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-02-25 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Kenley |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss, Kruse and Rogers |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 77, nays 17 |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendment 1 (Thompson), withdrawn |
2013-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Representatives Behning, Battles and Burton added as coauthors |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-22 | House | Authored by Representative Porter |