IN HB1422 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 146
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dementia care. Provides that an area agency on aging designated by the bureau of aging services (area agency) may establish a dementia care specialist program. Allows an area agency to designate at least one individual as a dementia care specialist to administer the program. Provides that the division of aging (division) may employ a dementia care specialist coordinator. Sets forth the duties of: (1) a dementia care specialist; and (2) the dementia care specialist coordinator; if an area agency or the division establishes those positions. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Dementia care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Public Law 146 |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 445: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senator Melton added as third sponsor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second sponsor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as third sponsor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senator Melton removed as second sponsor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 373: yeas 39, nays 9 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Melton, Breaux |
2023-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-07 | House | Representative Jackson added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as coauthor |
2023-01-23 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Public Health |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Porter |
2023-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative Barrett |