IN HB1422 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: Senate Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcohol matters. Provides that a farm winery permit holder or an artisan distiller's permit holder may: (1) be the proprietor of a restaurant; (2) transfer wine or liquor from the winery or distillery to the restaurant; (3) have a window between the winery or distillery and the restaurant; and (4) have a doorway or other opening between the winery or distillery and the restaurant. Provides that a farm winery and a holder of a vintner's permit may sell their wine to consumers by the box or by the bulk container. Provides that a holder of a farm winery permit may hold a micro wine wholesaler's permit without complying with the requirements for holding a beer wholesaler's permit or liquor wholesaler's permit. Removes distillers and rectifiers from the entities that cannot have an interest in a beer permit. Repeals language that prohibited the holder of an artisan distiller's permit, a distiller's permit, or a rectifier's permit from owning or possessing a permit to sell liquor at wholesale. Repeals the crime prohibiting artisan distillers, distillers and rectifiers from owning holder shares of stock of a corporation that holds an Indiana permit to sell alcoholic beverages at retail. Provides that it is lawful for a holder of a retailer's permit to own or possess an interest in a distiller's permit or a farm winery permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol matters. Provides that a farm winery permit holder or an artisan distiller's permit holder may: (1) be the proprietor of a restaurant; (2) transfer wine or liquor from the winery or distillery to the restaurant; (3) have a window between the winery or distillery and the restaurant; and (4) have a doorway or other opening between the winery or distillery and the restaurant. Provides that a farm winery and a holder of a vintner's permit may sell their wine to consumers by the box or by the bulk container. Provides that a holder of a farm winery permit may hold a micro wine wholesaler's permit without complying with the requirements for holding a beer wholesaler's permit or liquor wholesaler's permit. Removes distillers and rectifiers from the entities that cannot have an interest in a beer permit. Repeals language that prohibited the holder of an artisan distiller's permit, a distiller's permit, or a rectifier's permit from owning or possessing a permit to sell liquor at wholesale. Repeals the crime prohibiting artisan distillers, distillers and rectifiers from owning holder shares of stock of a corporation that holds an Indiana permit to sell alcoholic beverages at retail. Provides that it is lawful for a holder of a retailer's permit to own or possess an interest in a distiller's permit or a farm winery permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Grooms, Garten and Messmer
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 69, nays 27
2019-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-16HouseRepresentative Lehman added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representatives Engleman and Fleming
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback