IN HB1420 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electric transmission facilities. Amends the chapter in the Indiana Code concerning electric transmission facilities as follows: (1) Specifies that the term "electric transmission facility" does not include a line installed solely for the purpose of connecting an electric generation facility to facilities owned by a public utility. (2) Repeals the definition of "local reliability electric transmission facility" and makes conforming changes. (3) Amends the provisions concerning an incumbent electric transmission owner's right of first refusal to construct, own, operate, and maintain certain electric transmission facilities, or upgrades to certain electric transmission facilities, as follows: (A) Specifies that the right of first refusal applies with respect to: (ii) the construction; or (ii) upgrades; of electric transmission facilities if the construction or upgrades have been approved through a regional transmission organization (RTO) planning process. (B) Provides that if an electric transmission facility has been approved for construction through an RTO planning process: (i) each incumbent electric transmission owner that has a right to construct, own, operate, and maintain the electric transmission facility shall give written notice to the Indiana Utility Regulatory Commission (IURC), not later than 90 days after the construction is approved, regarding the incumbent electric transmission owner's intent to construct, own, operate, and maintain the approved electric transmission facility; and (ii) if an incumbent electric transmission owner gives notice of intent not to construct the approved electric transmission facility, another entity may seek to construct the approved electric transmission facility in accordance with the RTO planning process and the bill's provisions. (C) Provides that if an incumbent electric transmission owner gives to the IURC during a calendar year notice of its intent to construct, own, operate, and maintain an approved electric transmission facility, the incumbent electric transmission owner shall, not later than May 1 of the subsequent calendar year, provide the IURC with certain specified information. (D) Provides that an incumbent electric transmission owner that exercises its right to construct an approved electric transmission facility must, to the extent commercially practicable, use competitively bid engineering, procurement, or construction contracts that meet the specifications required by the incumbent electric transmission owner with respect to the facility.
Title
Electric transmission facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Chris Jeter [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Public Law 145 |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 470: yeas 55, nays 39 |
2023-04-20 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 32, nays 17 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau and Niezgodski added as cosponsors |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senator Donato added as cosponsor |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second sponsor |
2023-02-28 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 59, nays 39 |
2023-02-20 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-07 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |
2023-01-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative Jeter |