IN HB1419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin, Taylor G and Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin, Taylor G and Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Various alcoholic beverage matters. Allows alcoholic beverages of any type to be sold from a portable structure or cart on a golf course. Repeals provisions regarding the following: (1) Malt manufacturer's permit. (2) Malt wholesaler's permit. (3) Malt dealer's permit. (4) Malt excise tax. (5) Seasonal resort hotel permit.. Maintains the escrow process for retailer or dealer permits issued before July 1, 2019. Provides that for a retailer or dealer permit issued after June 30, 2019, the permit may be deposited in escrow for not more than three (3) years. Amends for consistency provisions that allow a manufacturer of two
Title
Various alcoholic beverage matters. Allows alcoholic beverages of any type to be sold from a portable structure or cart on a golf course. Repeals provisions regarding the following: (1) Malt manufacturer's permit. (2) Malt wholesaler's permit. (3) Malt dealer's permit. (4) Malt excise tax. (5) Seasonal resort hotel permit.. Maintains the escrow process for retailer or dealer permits issued before July 1, 2019. Provides that for a retailer or dealer permit issued after June 30, 2019, the permit may be deposited in escrow for not more than three (3) years. Amends for consistency provisions that allow a manufacturer of two
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin, Taylor G and Ford |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Alting and Lanane |
2018-03-07 | House | House advisors appointed: Young J, Burton, Wesco, Lehman and Austin |
2018-03-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Smaltz and GiaQuinta |
2018-03-07 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 333: yeas 41, nays 8 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as second sponsor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Alting |
2018-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 85, nays 7 |
2018-01-29 | House | Amendment #1 (GiaQuinta) failed; Division of the House: yeas 43, nays 50 |
2018-01-29 | House | Amendment #4 (Morrison) failed; voice vote |
2018-01-29 | House | Amendment #2 (GiaQuinta) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-29 | House | Amendment #7 (Cook) failed; Division of the House: yeas 39, nays 54 |
2018-01-29 | House | Amendment #5 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |