IN HB1417 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - First Reading: Referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
Pending: Senate Homeland Security & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Civic event license plates and vehicles. Authorizes certain vehicles to be registered as civic event motor vehicles and to display a civic event license plate after the term of the civic event under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civic event license plates and vehicles. Authorizes certain vehicles to be registered as civic event motor vehicles and to display a civic event license plate after the term of the civic event under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
2015-02-11HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-10HouseSenator Crider added as sponsor
2015-02-10HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 96, nays 2
2015-02-09HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-05HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Speedy

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback