IN HB1412 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-17 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher salaries. Provides that a school corporation may offer a teacher who on June 30, 2011: (1) was employed with the school corporation; and (2) had at least 10 years of teaching experience; a one time annual salary increase. Provides that compensation attributable to additional degrees or graduate credits for which a teacher has started course work before July 1, 2011, and completed course work before September 2, 2018, shall also continue for school years beginning after June 30, 2015. (Current law provides that compensation attributable to additional degrees for which a teacher has started course work before July 1,
Title
Teacher salaries. Provides that a school corporation may offer a teacher who on June 30, 2011: (1) was employed with the school corporation; and (2) had at least 10 years of teaching experience; a one time annual salary increase. Provides that compensation attributable to additional degrees or graduate credits for which a teacher has started course work before July 1, 2011, and completed course work before September 2, 2018, shall also continue for school years beginning after June 30, 2015. (Current law provides that compensation attributable to additional degrees for which a teacher has started course work before July 1,
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-17 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-17 | House | Authored by Representative Thompson |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1412/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/e/f/3fef220c/HB1412.01.INTR.pdf |