IN HB1406 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Public Law 252
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal offenses. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally manufactures or finances the manufacture of methamphetamine commits manufacturing methamphetamine, a Level 4 felony. Specifies circumstances under which the crime is a Level 3 or Level 2 felony. Provides that the crime of strangulation includes application of pressure to a victim's torso, and increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony if it is knowingly committed against a pregnant woman. Provides that a person commits controlled substances criminal mischief if the person damages property while manufacturing or dealing in a controlled substance. (Under current law, the statute applies only to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal offenses. Provides that a person who knowingly or intentionally manufactures or finances the manufacture of methamphetamine commits manufacturing methamphetamine, a Level 4 felony. Specifies circumstances under which the crime is a Level 3 or Level 2 felony. Provides that the crime of strangulation includes application of pressure to a victim's torso, and increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony if it is knowingly committed against a pregnant woman. Provides that a person commits controlled substances criminal mischief if the person damages property while manufacturing or dealing in a controlled substance. (Under current law, the statute applies only to

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HousePublic Law 252
2017-04-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 499: yeas 41, nays 8
2017-04-21HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2017-04-21SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2017-04-20HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 512: yeas 87, nays 11
2017-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2017-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2017-04-19SenateSenator Young M added as conferee
2017-04-19SenateSenator Young M removed as advisor
2017-04-19SenateSenator Lanane removed as conferee
2017-04-10SenateSenator Houchin added as advisor
2017-04-10SenateSenate advisors appointed: Freeman, Randolph Lonnie M and Young M
2017-04-10SenateSenate conferees appointed: Koch and Lanane
2017-04-10HouseHouse advisors appointed: Young J, Negele, DeLaney and Pierce
2017-04-10HouseHouse conferees appointed: Washburne and Hatfield
2017-04-10HouseRepresentative Smaltz removed as coauthor
2017-04-10HouseRepresentative Olthoff added as coauthor
2017-04-06HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2017-04-06HouseMotion to dissent filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 400: yeas 41, nays 6
2017-04-04SenateSenator Freeman added as second sponsor
2017-04-04SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #3 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #2 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-20SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2017-02-08HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-07HouseRepresentative Carbaugh added as coauthor
2017-02-07HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Koch
2017-02-07HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 95, nays 0
2017-02-06HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as coauthor
2017-02-06HouseRepresentative Smaltz added as coauthor
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-02HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-17HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2017-01-17HouseAuthored by Representative Washburne

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1406/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/4/7/55474098/HB1406.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/b/4/2fb43802/HB1406.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/a/f/a4af381e/HB1406.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/4/5/8545bc32/HB1406.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/a/1/7aa1e0a5/HB1406.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/e/3/cde33377/HB1406.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/9/2/0b92e654/HB1406.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/2/3/a0230e3e/HB1406.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/2/e/512e6e9f/HB1406.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/0/c/d40c574f/HB1406.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/4/3/fc439b99/HB1406.76.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/2/0/26203420/HB1406.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/0/a/cd0a7093/HB1406.400.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/5/e/4e5ea309/HB1406.512.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/9/9/a5995957/HB1406.499.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback