IN HB1405 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation of data centers. Provides that a county or municipal fiscal body may designate an area in which a property tax exemption will be provided for certain enterprise information technology equipment. Provides a state sales and use tax exemption (exemption) for the purchase of certain data center equipment that is located in a data center that results in a minimum qualified investment within five years, ranging from at least $25,000,000 to more than $150,000,000 depending on the population of the county in which the data center is located. Provides that costs that meet the requirement are exempt from the state gross retail tax. Requires a qualified data center user to apply to the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC) for a specific transaction award certificate (award certificate). Requires a qualified data center user to enter into an agreement with the IEDC as a condition of receiving an award certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation of data centers. Provides that a county or municipal fiscal body may designate an area in which a property tax exemption will be provided for certain enterprise information technology equipment. Provides a state sales and use tax exemption (exemption) for the purchase of certain data center equipment that is located in a data center that results in a minimum qualified investment within five years, ranging from at least $25,000,000 to more than $150,000,000 depending on the population of the county in which the data center is located. Provides that costs that meet the requirement are exempt from the state gross retail tax. Requires a qualified data center user to apply to the Indiana economic development corporation (IEDC) for a specific transaction award certificate (award certificate). Requires a qualified data center user to enter into an agreement with the IEDC as a condition of receiving an award certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 256
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 544: yeas 44, nays 0
2019-04-18HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 557: yeas 84, nays 6
2019-04-17SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-17HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Holdman, Niezgodski and Charbonneau
2019-04-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Messmer and Taylor G
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehman, Pressel, Chyung and Jackson
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Soliday and Harris
2019-04-02HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-01HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-03-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-25SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2019-03-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 311: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-03-21SenateAmendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-21SenateAmendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-19SenateSenator Houchin added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third sponsor
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-11SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseRepresentatives Harris and Huston added as coauthors
2019-02-19HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Holdman
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 95, nays 1
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-11HouseRepresentative Jackson added as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseRepresentatives Pressel and Lehman added as coauthors
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1405/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/0/d/e70db65a/HB1405.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/1/a/731a3cda/HB1405.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/6/4/916474db/HB1405.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/4/3/374389f7/HB1405.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/d/9/1ad9ed6e/HB1405.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/b/b/c2bb1c3b/HB1405.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/8/a/a58a7885/HB1405.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/4/f/3c4fb05b/HB1405.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/8/0/73806905/HB1405.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/6/8/a968523f/HB1405.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/3/d/ce3d02cb/HB1405.232.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/f/1/1ef128e2/HB1405.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/c/6/0cc65cd2/HB1405.311.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/7/6/3876a3f9/HB1405.557.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/c/e/e1ce0d4c/HB1405.544.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback