IN HB1405 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State examiner, attorney general, and prosecuting attorneys. Provides that if the state examiner of the state board of accounts: (1) refers to a prosecuting attorney certain violations of the law that were committed by a local public officer concerning the state examiner or the state board of accounts; and (2) discovers that a subsequent, unrelated violation has been committed by the local public officer; the state examiner may refer the matter to the attorney general. Allows the attorney general to: (1) bring a civil action to remove the local public officer from office; and (2) combine the civil action with

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State examiner, attorney general, and prosecuting attorneys. Provides that if the state examiner of the state board of accounts: (1) refers to a prosecuting attorney certain violations of the law that were committed by a local public officer concerning the state examiner or the state board of accounts; and (2) discovers that a subsequent, unrelated violation has been committed by the local public officer; the state examiner may refer the matter to the attorney general. Allows the attorney general to: (1) bring a civil action to remove the local public officer from office; and (2) combine the civil action with

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-25HouseSenator Niemeyer added as sponsor
2015-02-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 63, nays 29
2015-02-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Fine
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Slager

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback