IN HB1404 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Amendment #2 (Leising) prevailed; Roll Call 471: yeas 35, nays 14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School accountability. Provides that a high school may count: (1) an approved work based learning course, program, or experience; or (2) an approved career and technical education course, program, or experience; as satisfying an Indiana diploma with a Core 40 with academic honors designation or another designation requirement. Provides that a course, program, or experience: (1) with subject matter that is similar to and rigor that is equal to or greater than the subject matter and rigor of a required course; but (2) that does not fully align with the required course standards; must be augmented with instruction to include the remaining standards of the required course. Provides that the state board of education (state board), a state educational institution, or any other entity designated by the state board: (1) shall approve a course, program, or experience if certain conditions are met; (2) shall periodically review the approved course, program, or experience; and (3) may revoke approval of the course, program, or experience under certain conditions. Provides that, before July 1, 2022, the state board of education shall establish new standards of measuring high school performance. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School accountability. Provides that a high school may count: (1) an approved work based learning course, program, or experience; or (2) an approved career and technical education course, program, or experience; as satisfying an Indiana diploma with a Core 40 with academic honors designation or another designation requirement. Provides that a course, program, or experience: (1) with subject matter that is similar to and rigor that is equal to or greater than the subject matter and rigor of a required course; but (2) that does not fully align with the required course standards; must be augmented with instruction to include the remaining standards of the required course. Provides that the state board of education (state board), a state educational institution, or any other entity designated by the state board: (1) shall approve a course, program, or experience if certain conditions are met; (2) shall periodically review the approved course, program, or experience; and (3) may revoke approval of the course, program, or experience under certain conditions. Provides that, before July 1, 2022, the state board of education shall establish new standards of measuring high school performance. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Leising) prevailed (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Third reading (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #2 (Leising) prevailed; Roll Call 471: yeas 35, nays 14
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-04-04SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2019-03-11SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-02-21HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-20HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Raatz
2019-02-20HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 57, nays 39
2019-02-19HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseRepresentative Goodin added as coauthor
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Behning
2019-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1404/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/6/1/ac61e1e4/HB1404.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/2/7/9127f125/HB1404.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/8/1/0f81a14c/HB1404.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/3/a/653ad04f/HB1404.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/e/4/3de44b2d/HB1404.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/b/8/b2b8a9b8/HB1404.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/5/a/825aa042/HB1404.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/d/b/62dbc5cf/HB1404.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/2/8/45284b67/HB1404.248.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/e/0/c3e0686a/HB1404.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/d/a/07da928b/HB1404.471.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback