IN HB1404 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Third reading: call withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Traffic violations. Provides that certain governmental entities may enter into agreements to use photographically recorded images to enforce certain traffic violations, and prohibits certain governmental entities to use photographically recorded images to enforce any other traffic violation. Imposes civil penalties for certain traffic violations detected by photographically recorded images. Provides that an enforcement agreement must provide for distribution of civil penalties among the parties to the agreement, and to various funds. Amends the definition of "highway work zone" and renames the term as "work zone". Repeals the definition of "worksite". Defines "critical work zone" for purposes of enforcing work zone

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic violations. Provides that certain governmental entities may enter into agreements to use photographically recorded images to enforce certain traffic violations, and prohibits certain governmental entities to use photographically recorded images to enforce any other traffic violation. Imposes civil penalties for certain traffic violations detected by photographically recorded images. Provides that an enforcement agreement must provide for distribution of civil penalties among the parties to the agreement, and to various funds. Amends the definition of "highway work zone" and renames the term as "work zone". Repeals the definition of "worksite". Defines "critical work zone" for purposes of enforcing work zone

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-18 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-24HouseThird reading: call withdrawn
2015-02-23HouseRepresentative Brown, C. added as coauthor
2015-02-23HouseAmendment #1 (Soliday) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-23HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-19HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-22HouseRepresentative Smith, M. added as coauthor
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2015-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative DeLaney
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Soliday

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback