IN HB1403 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the owner of a rental unit assessed any fee by a political subdivision pertaining to the rental unit may: (1) notify the tenants of the rental unit of the assessment of the fee; and (2) require the tenants of the rental unit to reimburse the owner for the payment of the fee. (Current law refers to "inspection, registration, or other fee".) Requires fees regarding rental units and rental communities to be deposited in a dedicated fund to for reimbursement of costs actually incurred by the political subdivision relating to the imposition and amount of the fee. Restricts the circumstances and conditions in which a political subdivision may require a rental unit's owner or landlord to obtain a permit. Allows an owner of a rental unit to obtain an exemption from a political subdivision's inspection and inspection fee requirements if the rental unit satisfies certain requirements. Allows a political subdivision to impose a penalty for an act constituting a nuisance or ordinance violation. Allows a successful county, city, or town or a successful defendant to recover attorney's fees incurred in a nuisance action. Provides that a political subdivision may assess an annual registration fee. Repeals superseded statutes relating to local regulation of residential landlord and tenant relations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of residential rental property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-11 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 140304 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 29 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Roll Call 140301 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 193
2014-03-11HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 440: yeas 67 and nays 24
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Slager added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Turner removed as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Bray added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Randolph added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Head added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator R. Young added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenator Holdman added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Turner added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Lawson added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative McMillin added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 343: yeas 34 and nays 12
2014-03-03SenateSenator Head added second sponsor.
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1403 Amendment #5 (Lanane), failed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1403 Amendment #4 (Lanane), failed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1403 Amendment #2 (Holdman), prevailed.
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Local Government
2014-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-02-03HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 210: yeas 67 and nays 28
2014-02-03HouseSenator Holdman added as first sponsor.
2014-02-03HouseRepresentative Turner added as coauthor.
2014-01-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-30HouseHB 1403 Amendment #6 (Truitt), prevailed.
2014-01-30HouseHB 1403 Amendment #3 (Candelaria Reardon), prevailed.
2014-01-30HouseHB 1403 Amendment #2 (Candelaria Reardon), failed.
2014-01-30HouseHB 1403 Amendment #1 (Candelaria Reardon), failed.
2014-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-21HouseRepresentative Austin added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseAuthored by Representative McMillin.
2014-01-15HouseCoauthored by Representative VanNatter
2014-01-15HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1403/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/c/6/26c63516/HB1403.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/9/e/f09ef6e2/HB1403.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/a/8/29a8b6fe/HB1403.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/f/3/a2f313d9/HB1403.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/7/e/337ead49/HB1403.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/5/5/e1554272/HB1403.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/3/5/dc35c3b2/HB1403.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/2/5/75250f0e/HB1403.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/f/1/a3f1f578/HB1403.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/e/d/f4edd775/HB1403.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/4/6/ca46b520/HB1403.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/3/6/753661e8/HB1403.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/6/1/dc6111f9/HB1403.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/7/6/2776c309/HB1403.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/b/a/dfba3e58/HB1403.02.COMH.138.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/4/9/c349534f/HB1403.02.COMH.140.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/b/3/9ab3b6b8/HB1403.02.COMH.139.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/f/4/97f4ca66/HB1403.03.ENGH.210.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/4/6/7746f629/HB1403.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/5/3/ab535b8d/HB1403.06.ENGS.343.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/4/c/4d4cf5e8/HB1403.06.ENGS.440.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback