IN HB1402 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Representative Bauer added as coauthor.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - Representative Bauer added as coauthor.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Converts the taxation of motorized heavy equipment vehicles from the property tax to an excise tax. Excludes motorized heavy equipment vehicles from property tax assessment in 2014. Provides that motorized heavy equipment vehicles are subject to registration with the department of state revenue and the excise tax beginning in 2015. Imposes a rental excise tax on the rental of motorized heavy equipment vehicles beginning in 2014. Provides a credit against the excise tax equal to the rental excise taxes paid in the preceding calendar year.
Title
Taxation of heavy equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | House | Representative Bauer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Niezgodski added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative Dermody. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1402/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/c/7/e2c73f38/HB1402.01.INTR.pdf |