IN HB1401 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Public Law 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid fraud. Expands the crime of Medicaid fraud to include knowingly or intentionally making, uttering, presenting, or causing to be presented to the Medicaid program a Medicaid claim that is materially false or misleading.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid fraud. Expands the crime of Medicaid fraud to include knowingly or intentionally making, uttering, presenting, or causing to be presented to the Medicaid program a Medicaid claim that is materially false or misleading.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23HousePublic Law 58
2015-04-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-10SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-04-09SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2015-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 400: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-04-07SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2015-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-17HouseSenator Young, M. added as sponsor
2015-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 94, nays 0
2015-02-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-12HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-10HouseRepresentatives Bacon and Hale added as coauthor
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2015-01-14HouseAuthored by Representative Washburne

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1401/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/9/e/6b9eeb86/HB1401.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/9/3/ee93a806/HB1401.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/d/0/a7d0c561/HB1401.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/3/3/703388f6/HB1401.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/c/c/cccc52be/HB1401.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/a/6/1da6c1d6/HB1401.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/5/d/335dc041/HB1401.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/a/5/e1a5515f/HB1401.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/c/d/4acd7374/HB1401.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/f/0/09f0cc54/HB1401.170.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/3/3/6433b288/HB1401.400.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback